EP1289026 - Thermoelectric active materials and Generators and Peltier devices comprising them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Carl-Bosch Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sterzel, Hans-Josef, Dr. Wasgauring 3 67125 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | 02 /
Kühling, Klaus, Dr. Friedrichstrasse 27 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018298.6 | 26.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE20011042634 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142634 | DE20021023743 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10223743 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289026 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1289026 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/16, H01L35/22, C01B35/04, C01B33/06, C01B19/00, C01B31/00, C01G3/00, C01G5/00, C01G23/00, C01G25/00, H01L35/34, C01G31/00, C01G33/00, C01G35/00, C01G37/00, C01G39/00, C01G41/00, C01G45/00, C01G49/00, C01G51/00, C01G53/00, C01F7/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H10N10/855 (EP,US);
H10N10/852 (EP);
H10N10/8556 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | H01L35/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Thermoelektrisch aktive Materialien und diese enthaltende Generatoren und Peltier-Anordnungen | [2003/10] | English: | Thermoelectric active materials and Generators and Peltier devices comprising them | [2003/10] | French: | Matériaux thermoélectriquement actifs et générateurs et dispositifs Peltier leur comprenant | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 24.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11103098 ; | [X]JPH06169110 ; | [A]JPH08242021 ; | [X]US3081361 (HENDERSON COURTLAND M, et al); | [X]US3081363 (HENDERSON COURTLAND M, et al); | [X]US3087002 (HENDERSON COURTLAND M, et al); | [X]US3127287 ; | [A]US3208878 (DONAHOE FRANCIS J); | [X]GB1015985 (MONSANTO CO); | [X]US3256698 (HENDERSON COURTLAND M); | [X]US3256702 (HENDERSON COURTLAND M); | [A]US3407037 (BIENERT WALTER B, et al); | [X]US3762960 (SKRABEK E, et al); | [X]EP0522182 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]US5547598 (AMANO TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5793092 (HABERMEIER HANNS-ULRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US6222242 (KONISHI AKIO [JP], et al); | [XD]US6225550 (HORNBOSTEL MARC [US], et al); | [XD]EP1102334 (BASF AG [DE]) |