EP1287805 - Dental adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8585 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states GC Corporation 76-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinichi, Kojima, c/o GC Corporation No. 76-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Arita, Akishi, c/o GC Corporation No. 76-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018400.8 | 14.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | JP20010261943 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001261943 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287805 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287805 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, A61K6/083 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/00 (EP,US);
A61K6/30, C08L43/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Dentalklebstoffzusammensetzung | [2003/10] | English: | Dental adhesive composition | [2003/10] | French: | Composition d'adhésif dentaire | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2004 | BG | 10.11.2004 | CZ | 10.11.2004 | EE | 10.11.2004 | FI | 10.11.2004 | SK | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | ES | 21.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BG | 10.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2004 | ||
EE | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
SK | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BG | 10.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
SK | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BG | 10.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
SK | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BG | 10.11.2004 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BG | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5089051 (EPPINGER BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]US5264513 (IKEMURA KUNIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]US5834532 (YAMAMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]US5925690 (FUCHIGAMI SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 24, line 38 - column 26, line 14 * * example - * * claim - *; | [X]EP1066813 (SHOFU KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example - * * claim - *; | [DX]JP2001072523 (SHOFU KK) | by applicant | JPH10245525 | JPH11140383 | JP2000159621 | JP2001072523 |