EP1286444 - Device for parallel operation of equal range single-phase or three-phase voltage sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Solare Energieversorgungstechnik (ISET) Verein an der Gesamthochschule Kassel e.V. Königstor 59 34119 Kassel / DE | [2006/42] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Institut für Solare Energieversorgungstechnik (ISET) Verein an der Gesamthochschule Kassel e.V. Königstor 59 34119 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engler, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Schleswiger Strasse 7 34131 Kassel / DE | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried, Dipl.-Phys. Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018526.0 | 17.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | DE2001140783 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140783 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286444 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1286444 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286444 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38, H02M7/48 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
H02M7/493 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum gleichberechtigten Parallelbetrieb von ein- oder dreiphasigen Spannungsquellen | [2003/09] | English: | Device for parallel operation of equal range single-phase or three-phase voltage sources | [2003/09] | French: | Dispositif pour l'entrainement en parallèle de sources de tension monophasées ou triphasées ayant le mème niveau | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.10.2006 | CZ | 18.10.2006 | EE | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | IE | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | SK | 18.10.2006 | TR | 18.10.2006 | BG | 18.01.2007 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | PT | 20.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 18.10.2006 | |
CZ | 18.10.2006 | ||
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
EE | 18.10.2006 | ||
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SK | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
IE | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 18.10.2006 | |
FI | 18.10.2006 | ||
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
BG | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 18.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6169679 (DENG DOUG D [US], et al) [A] 1* column 1; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - JENSEN U B ET AL, "Sharing of nonlinear load in parallel connected three-phase converters", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2000 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. THIRTY-FIFTH IAS ANNUAL MEETING AND WORLD CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY, (20001008), vol. 4, pages 2338 - 2344, XP010522583 [A] 1-4 * page 2338 - page 2340 * | [A] - IRAVANI M R ET AL, "APPLICATIONS OF STATIC PHASE SHIFTERS IN POWER SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIVERY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19940701), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0885-8977, pages 1600 - 1608, XP000484999 [A] 1 * page 1601 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/61.311204 | [DA] - TULADHAR A ET AL, "Parallel operation of single phase inverter modules with no control interconnections", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 1997. APEC '97 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 1997., TWELFTH ANNUAL ATLANTA, GA, USA 23-27 FEB. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970223), ISBN 0-7803-3704-2, pages 94 - 100, XP010215806 [DA] 1-4 * page 94 - page 98 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1997.581439 |