EP1271530 - Storage medium storing catalogue information and apparatus and method for playing back catalogue information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Jung-wan 684-6 Seo-ri, Yidong-myun Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Heo, Jung-kwon 401 Sangji Villa, 302-7 Yangjae 2-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Heo, Jae-hoon 102-204 Hanyang Apt. 1188, Kwonsun-dong Kwonsun-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Kang, Jung-seuk 101-1310 Keonyoung Apt., Munjung-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul / KR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02018554.2 | 04.03.1999 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | KR19980007525 | 06.03.1998 Original published format: KR 9807525 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271530 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271530 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/32, G11B27/10, G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B19/02 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
H04N9/877 (EP,US);
G11B20/02 (KR);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B19/022 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10546 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1062 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10944 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10953 (EP,US);
G11B2220/211 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/9261 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | G11B27/32, H04N5/85, G11B20/12, G11B19/02, G11B27/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/01] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsträger, welcher Kataloginformation speichert sowie Kataloginformationswiedergabegerät und -verfahren | [2003/01] | English: | Storage medium storing catalogue information and apparatus and method for playing back catalogue information | [2003/01] | French: | Support d'enregistrement stockant des informations catalogue et appareil et méthode de reproduction d'informations catalogue | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 09.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99301621.1 / EP0940815 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990301621) is 17.10.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0738999 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,10,12,14,16 * abstract * * column 10, line 24 - column 13, line 21 * * column 16, line 6 - column 17, line 10 * * column 18, line 54 - column 21, line 55 * * column 40, lines 9-33 * * column 42, lines 19-32 * * column 44, lines 31-40 * * column 46, lines 50-55 * * figures 1,5-8,13,59,61,63 *; | [A]JPH08314485 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,4,10,12,14,16* abstract *; | [X]EP0788101 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,10,12,14,16 * abstract * * page 15, line 37 - page 16, line 23 * * figures 19,20 * |