EP1285761 - Head unit in ink jet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Kenichiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Otsuki, Noboru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392-8502 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018708.4 | 21.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010250655 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001250655 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285761 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285761 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/055 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR);
B41J2/055 (EP,US);
B41J2/14 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14362 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14419 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Kopfeinheit für Tintenstrahldrucker | [2003/09] | English: | Head unit in ink jet printer | [2003/09] | French: | Tête pour imprimante jet d'encre | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | BE | 06.06.2007 | CH | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | LI | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | IE | 21.08.2007 | LU | 21.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 21.08.2007 | ||
LU | 21.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 21.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 21.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 21.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 17.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0855274 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,13,14 * figures 2-6,8,9,11-13 * [A] 15; | [XA]JPH1170667 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-3,5,13,14 * figure 4 * [A] 15; | [X]US5969736 (FIELD LESLIE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,14 * figure 1A * * column 6, line 34 - line 41 *; | [XA]EP1078760 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,13 * abstract * [A] 14; | [A]US6209997 (DUONG HA VAN [US], et al) [A] 1,14,15* figure 11 * | by applicant | JPH03224744 | JPH04269553 |