EP1287776 - Shower screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koralle Sanitärprodukte GmbH Hollwieser Strasse 45 32602 Vlotho / DE | [2003/38] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Koralle Sanitärprodukte GmbH Industriegelände Hollwiesen 32602 Vlotho / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Goeddaeus, Richard Bonneberger Strasse 44 32602 Vlotho / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018779.5 | 22.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE20011041655 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10141655 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287776 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/36, E05D1/02 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
E05D1/02 (EP);
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Duschabtrennung | [2003/10] | English: | Shower screen | [2003/10] | French: | Ecran de douche | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 26.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2503230 (BLANC RENE [FR]) [X] 1,2,8 * page 5, line 15 - line 30; figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [X]DE4013622 (CLIP LOK INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 28 - line 31 * * column 3, line 24 - line 32; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE2901371 (WALMUE BADEOEFEN CHRISTIAN WAL) [X] 1,4-7 * page 32, line 3 - page 33, line 15; figures 1-7 * [Y] 9; | [YA]US5502930 (BURKETTE ANDREW J [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-5 * [A] 1; | [X]US1697277 (HOOPES CHARLES L) [X] 1,9 * page 1, column R, line 72 - page 2, column L, line 51; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1033233 (MECANIQUE & PLASTIQUE S A); | [PX]EP1170447 (KORALLE SANITAERPRODUKTE [DE]) [PX] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3; claim 6 * |