EP1394301 - Driving device for the blade-holder carriage in a double plush loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖNHERR Textilmaschinenbau GmbH Schönherrstrasse 8 09113 Chemnitz / DE | [2006/23] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states SCHÖNHERR Textilmaschinenbau GmbH Schönherrstrasse 8 09113 Chemnitz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gössl, Rainer, Dr. Jahnsdorfer Strasse 17 09387 Jahnsdorf/Erzgebirge / DE | 02 /
Burkert, Martin Friedrich-Puchta-Strasse 18 95444 Bayreuth / DE | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2007/07] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2004/10] | Schneider, Manfred Patentanwaltsbüro Schneider Annaberger Strasse 73 09111 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018886.8 | 24.08.2002 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394301 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1394301 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D03D39/18, B26D5/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
D03D39/18 (EP);
B26D1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, TR [2004/48] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern des Antriebes für den Messerschlitten einer Doppelflorwebmaschine | [2004/10] | English: | Driving device for the blade-holder carriage in a double plush loom | [2004/10] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour le chariot porte-lame d'un métier à tisser double peluche | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 04.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.06.2006 | [2007/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10004904 (SCHOENHERR TEXTILMASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19536002 (CHEMNITZER WEBMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1217115 (SCHOENHERR TEXTILMASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4263790 (STOPP FRITZ, et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE3816206 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 12,13,15; | [XA]DE3416477 (CARL SCHLEMPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 14 * page 2 - page 6; figures 1-3 * [A] 12,13,15; | [A]US4201101 (GERBER HEINZ J [US]) [A] 12,14 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 32; figure 10 * |