EP1288069 - Vehicle headlight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2009/51] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniuchi, Hitoshi 2-9-13 Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
Nagano, Kouichi 2-9-13 Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018926.2 | 23.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | JP20010254681 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001254681 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288069 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288069 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288069 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/12 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
B60Q1/12 (EP,US);
B62J6/026 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/112 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/122 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/136 (EP,US);
F21S41/675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugscheinwerfer | [2003/10] | English: | Vehicle headlight | [2003/10] | French: | Phare de véhicule | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2000195325 ; | [YA]JP2001023415 ; | [A]JPH0558363 ; | [A]US5412543 (KOBAYASHI SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,9,10,19,20 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5426571 (JONES JERRY [US]) [Y] 17,19,20 * figures 1-3,8,20 * * columns 1-3 * * claims 1-7 * [A] 18; | [XY]DE4418135 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-13,16,18 * the whole document * [Y] 4-7,14,15,17,19,20; | [A]DE19817594 (BAIER KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,17 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1213532 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-10,12-16,18-20 * figures 4,23-38 * * columns 1-4 * * columns 33-36 * * paragraphs [0152] - [0156] * * columns 61-64 * * columns 71-72 * * claims 1-63 *; | [PA]US2002093827 (ISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP]) [PA] * the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000195325 A 20000714 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4-7,14 * abstract * [A] 1,2,8,12 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001023415 A 20010126 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 15 * abstract * [A] 1,2,4,5,12-14,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930713), vol. 017, no. 370, Database accession no. (M - 1444), & JP05058363 A 19930309 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2,17,20 * abstract * |