EP1276030 - Fluid control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohmi, Tadahiro 2-1-17-301, Komegafukuro Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi / JP | For all designated states Fujikin Incorporated 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Ohmi, Tadahiro 2-1-17-301, Komegafukuro, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJIKIN INCORPORATED 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohmi, Tadahiro 2-1-17-301, Komegafukuro, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Hirao, Keiji, c/o Fujikin Inc. 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Minai, Yukio, c/o Fujikin Inc. 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Yamaji, Michio, c/o Fujikin Inc. 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Hirose, Takashi, c/o Fujikin Inc. 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Ikeda, Nobukazu, c/o Fujikin Inc. 3-2, Itachibori 2-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Paul & Albrecht, Patentanwaltssozietät, Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018943.7 | 07.05.1997 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | JP19960116204 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11620496 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276030 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1276030 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/00, H01L21/00, F15B13/00 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
F16K27/003 (EP,US);
H01L21/67034 (KR);
H01L21/02046 (KR);
H01L21/02312 (KR);
Y10T137/4259 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87684 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | G05D7/00, H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | [2003/43] |
Former [2003/03] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Fluidsteuervorrichtung | [2003/03] | English: | Fluid control device | [2003/03] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle pour fluides | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97107532.0 / EP0806573 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4281683 (HETHERINGTON ROBERT D, et al) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]FR2628501 (EFEREL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 18; figure 2 *; | [X]US5224513 (BERTONE DANIELE [IT]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 11-26 * * figure - *; | [A]US5368062 (OKUMURA KATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * |