|
13.05.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.02.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.12.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.12.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.12.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Request for correction of client data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.05.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Fax relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.09.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.09.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
50 |
|
12.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
22.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |