EP1291560 - Power assisted gear shift device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körber, Martin Eugen-Roth-Strasse 4 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2003/11] | Application number, filing date | 02019276.1 | 28.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | DE2001143885 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10143885 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291560 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291560 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1291560 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, F16H63/32 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
F16H63/32 (EP,US);
F16H63/3023 (EP,US);
F16H2063/3079 (EP,US);
F16H2063/325 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20024 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20177 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/02] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hilfskraftunterstützte Getriebeschaltvorrichtung | [2003/11] | English: | Power assisted gear shift device | [2003/11] | French: | Dispositif de changement de rapports à commande assistée | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2510697 (JACOBY JOHN W) [X] 1-3,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [XA]GB1268847 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-4,11,13 * the whole document * [A] 6,10; | [A]US4998443 (JANISZEWSKI GRZEGORZ [SE]) [A] 1-3,6,10,11,13* abstract *; | [A]EP0731298 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 9, line 4 - column 10, line 41; figures 3,8 * |