EP1266977 - Lustrous pigment and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | 06.07.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eckart GmbH Kaiserstrasse 30 90763 Fürth / DE | [2008/02] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states ECKART GmbH & Co. KG Kaiserstrasse 30 90763 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states ECKART GmbH & Co. KG Kaiserstrasse 30 D-90763 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sommer, Günter, Dr. Martin-Behaim-Strasse 6 91217 Hersbruck / DE | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019340.5 | 31.01.2001 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | DE2000104888 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004888 | [2002/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1266977 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1266977 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266977 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/00, C09C1/24, C09C1/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
C09C1/0021 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C1/0018 (EP,US);
C09C1/0051 (EP,US);
C09C1/0078 (EP,US);
C09C1/36 (EP,US);
C09D5/36 (EP,US);
C23C14/0005 (EP,US);
C23C14/028 (EP,US);
C23C14/0623 (EP,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/085 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1037 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1054 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1087 (EP,US);
C09C2200/24 (EP,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,US);
C09C2200/302 (EP,US);
C09C2220/10 (EP,US);
C09C2220/103 (EP,US);
C09C2220/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/51] | C23C14/00, C09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/47] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Glanzpigment und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/51] | English: | Lustrous pigment and method of producing the same | [2002/51] | French: | Pigment interférentiel et procédé de production | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 27.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01949009.3 / EP1252355 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2006
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF Schweiz AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2012/13] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2006
15.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2006/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.02.2006
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 P.O. Box/Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 31.03.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2006 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2006 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.04.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 24.04.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/32] | 24.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 24.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1190/08 | 14.07.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.04.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 24.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.09.2005 | GB | 31.01.2010 | IT | 31.01.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/05] | ES | 05.09.2005 | |
GB | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 05.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP01054071 ; | [Y]US3123490 (R.A. BOLOMEY) [Y] 1,7 * column 7, line 5 - line 23; examples 1,8 *; | [A]US5135812 (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 7, line 55 - column 12, line 13 *; | [A]WO9308237 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 19, line 7 - page 22, line 26 *; | [X]WO9838254 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 8-10 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 25 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890609), vol. 013, no. 249, Database accession no. (C - 605), & JP01054071 A 19890301 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [Y] 1,7 * abstract * |