EP1290956 - Energy absorbing protective device that protects areas of articulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit "La Ravoire" 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2008/13] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states SALOMON S.A. Lieudit "La Ravoire" 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berns, Jason 33 rue Sommeiller 74000 Annecy / FR | [2003/11] | Application number, filing date | 02019532.7 | 02.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010948255 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: US 948255 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1290956 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1290956 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290956 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A41D31/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A41D13/0153 (EP,US);
A41D13/0593 (EP,US);
A41D31/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Energie absorbierende Schutzvorrichtung für Gelenkzone | [2003/11] | English: | Energy absorbing protective device that protects areas of articulation | [2003/11] | French: | Dispositif de protection absorbant l'énergie destiné aux zones d'articulation | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IT | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | IE | 02.09.2008 | LU | 02.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
LU | 02.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
LU | 02.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9102039U (GERICKE HEIN GMBH CO KG ; ISL SCHAUMSTOFF TECHNIK GMBH (DE)) [A] 1,2,8-10,16,22,23,29-31,37,42,43,45,46 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2246282 (VESTY [GB]); | [A]EP0591575 (GERICKE HEIN GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5-7,16-18,20,22,37-39,41 * figures 4,5; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9418861 (VIIO MATTI [SE]) [X] 1,8-10,21,22,29-31,42,43,45,46 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5680657 (VALTAKARI ANTTI [FI]); | [AD]US6093468 (TOMS DOUGLAS [US], et al) [AD] 1,3,4,22,24,25 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2797154 (INST NAT RECH SECURITE [FR]) [A] 1,5,7-10,14,15,22,26,35,36 * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 4; figure 7 *; | [A]US6202217 (KARALL GERHARD [AT]) |