EP1292049 - Radio base station and method of controlling radio communications with transmit diversity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Sung Uk, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Futakata, Toshiyuki, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/48] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
Moon, Sung Uk, Int. Prop. Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower, 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Futakata, Toshiyuki, Int.Prop.Dpt., NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower, 2-11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019758.8 | 04.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010270870 | 06.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001270870 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292049 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1292049 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292049 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/005 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H04B7/0678 (EP,US);
H04B7/005 (EP,US);
H04B7/0667 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/13] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funkbasistation und Verfahren zur Funkübertragungsregelung mit Sende-Diversity | [2003/11] | English: | Radio base station and method of controlling radio communications with transmit diversity | [2003/11] | French: | Station de base et procédé de commande de communications radio avec de l'émission en diversité | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0776101 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 56 - column 7, line 7 * * column 11, line 4 - column 12, line 32 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO0011806 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 5, lines 16-23 * * page 12, line 21 - page 15, line 14 ** figure 4 *; | [A]DE19850279 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, lines 8-60 * * page 5, lines 12-55 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 3 * |