EP1293317 - Device for releasing and removing flexible synthetic material elements from a molding surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOCIETA' COOPERATIVA in breve SACMI IMOLA S.C. Via Provinciale Selice 17/A 40026 Imola BO / IT | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOCIETA' COOPERATIVA in breve SACMI IMOLA S.C. Via Provinciale Selice 17/A 40026 Imola / IT | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA S.c.r.l. Via Provinciale Selice, 17/A 40026 Imola BO / IT | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA S.c.r.l. Via Selice Provinciale, 17/A 40026 Imola (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassi, Giovanni Via Portisano, 41 48018 Faenza (Prov.of Ravenna) / IT | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/12] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02019852.9 | 09.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00556 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: IT BO20010556 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293317 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293317 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/46, B29C43/02, B29C37/00 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B29C43/08 (EP,US);
B29C37/0003 (EP,US);
B29C43/50 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3272 (EP,US);
B29C43/42 (EP,US);
B29L2001/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | 21.02.2003 | LT | 21.02.2003 | LV | 21.02.2003 | MK | 21.02.2003 | RO | 21.02.2003 | SI | 21.02.2003 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ablösen und Entfernen von flexiblen, synthetischen Materialelementen von Matrizenoberfläche | [2003/12] | English: | Device for releasing and removing flexible synthetic material elements from a molding surface | [2003/12] | French: | Dispositif de démoulage et de prélèvement d'un élément synthétique flexible | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 04.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | BE | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | CZ | 01.02.2006 | EE | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | FR | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | SK | 01.02.2006 | TR | 01.02.2006 | BG | 01.05.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | GB | 09.09.2006 | LU | 09.09.2006 | IE | 11.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 09.09.2006 | ||
LU | 09.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 09.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 09.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 09.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 09.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0807511 (NAMBA PRESS KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1* column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 22 *; | [X]US5728333 (TABATA KEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 39; figures 1B,1C *; | [PX]US6440348 (OPPELT HERBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * |