EP1294085 - Heating oven for dynamo-electric machine component manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becherucci, Raffaele Via. S. Zanobi, 7 50018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT | 02 /
Stratico, Gianfranco Via Antonio Lombardi, 32 53100 Siena / IT | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02019979.0 | 05.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US20010317580P | 05.09.2001 Original published format: US 317580 P | US20020234919 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 234919 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294085 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1294085 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12, F26B3/04 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
F26B11/04 (EP,US);
F24V40/00 (EP,US);
F26B11/028 (EP,US);
H02K15/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | H02K15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Heizungsofen zur Herstellung Dynamoelektrischer Maschinenkomponenten | [2003/12] | English: | Heating oven for dynamo-electric machine component manufacture | [2003/12] | French: | Four chauffant pour la production de composantes de machines électrodynamiques | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 03.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3244918 (PENNELL CHARLES V, et al) [A] 1,13* column 5, lines 26-45; figure 4 *; | [A]US3729832 (LUND E) [A] 1,13 * column A * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4162141 (WEST CLARENCE W [US]) [A] 1,3,8,9,12,14,15,17,18 * column A * * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4625867 (GUIBERT RAUL [US]) [A] 1,3-6,8,9,12-18 * column A * * column 5, lines 6-47 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 61; figures 1-9 * |