EP1306289 - Front body structure for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitagawa, Yuichi 1-14-1-906, Futaba Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020172.9 | 09.09.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | JP20010330734 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001330734 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306289 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1306289 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/11, B62D21/15, B62D25/08 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B62D21/155 (EP,US);
B60G2206/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/04] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorderwagenstruktur eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2003/18] | English: | Front body structure for vehicle | [2003/18] | French: | Structure avant de carrosserie de véhicule automobile | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06008024.9 / EP1676769 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000016327 ; | [PX]JP2002053076 ; | [PA]JP2001310755 ; | [Y]US5611569 (SEKIGUCHI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 12 * column 3, line 36 - column 3, line 55; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE19959607 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 3,6 * figures 1,9,10; claim 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000016327 A 20000118 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,13,15,17 * abstract * [Y] 3,6,12 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002053076 A 20020219 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [PX] 1,2,6-8,10,13,15,17 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001310755 A 20011106 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [PA] 1-17 * abstract * |