EP1298504 - Method and device for improving the response characteristic of a command controlled installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Systems GmbH Otto-Dürr-Strasse 8 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Dürr Systems GmbH Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meissner, Alexander, Dr. Schenkendorfstrasse 17 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. v. Bezold & Sozien Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020578.7 | 17.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | DE20011048097 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10148097 | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298504 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298504 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/42, G05B13/04 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G05B11/42 (EP);
G05B13/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung des Ansprechverhaltens einer befehlsgesteuerten Anlage | [2003/14] | English: | Method and device for improving the response characteristic of a command controlled installation | [2003/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer la réponse d'une installation contrôlée par commandes | [2004/13] |
Former [2003/14] | Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer la réponse d 'une installation contrôlée par commandes | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.08.2004 | CY | 04.08.2004 | CZ | 04.08.2004 | EE | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | IE | 04.08.2004 | SK | 04.08.2004 | TR | 04.08.2004 | AT | 17.09.2004 | LU | 17.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | BG | 04.08.2004 | |
CY | 04.08.2004 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
EE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
TR | 04.08.2004 | ||
AT | 17.09.2004 | ||
LU | 17.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/03] | BG | 04.08.2004 | |
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
EE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
TR | 04.08.2004 | ||
AT | 17.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 04.08.2004 | |
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
TR | 04.08.2004 | ||
AT | 17.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 04.08.2004 | |
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
AT | 17.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 04.08.2004 | |
CZ | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | CZ | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
SK | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5715158 (CHEN SHIH-CHIN [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 55 *; | [A]US5847952 (SAMAD TARIQ [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 10 - column 9, line 40 *; | [A]US6081751 (LUO RONGFU [US], et al) [A] 1* column 11, line 8 - column 12, line 11 * | Examination | US4353730 | US5357583 | US5394322 |