EP1302243 - Closed system storage plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes New Jersey 07417 / US | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tyndorf, Tadeusz A. 8 Sandpiper Drive Manalapan, New Jersey 07726 / US | 02 /
Cannataro, Richard 186 Rose Palce West Paterson, New Jersey 07424 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020628.0 | 13.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | US20010324815P | 25.09.2001 Original published format: US 324815 P | US20020241121 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: US 241121 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302243 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302243 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
G01N35/1079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/02] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschlossene Mikroplatten | [2003/16] | English: | Closed system storage plates | [2003/16] | French: | Microplaques fermes | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 17.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Request for further processing for: | 02.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 02.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 26.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5516490 (SANADI ASHOK R [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 34 - column 6, line 48 *; | [X]WO0130490 (ACLARA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 16 - page 6, line 19 *; | [X]US6258325 (SANADI ASHOK RAMESH [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 50 * * column 8, line 1 - column 8, line 14 *; | [XP]EP1155742 (GENETIX LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-3 * claims 9,10 ** column 4, line 20 - column 4, line 50 * |