EP1293346 - Method and device for verifying coloring agent cartridge for printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI, Akira No. 3-6-606, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosugi, Tadatsugu No. 1-17, Bunkyo 1-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020652.0 | 13.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | JP20010279729 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001279729 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293346 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, G06K19/12, G06K19/06 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/17546 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/50] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überprüfen von Farbmittelpatronen für Drucker | [2003/12] | English: | Method and device for verifying coloring agent cartridge for printer | [2003/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de vérification des cartouches de colorant pour imprimante | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE3405164 (OLYMPIA WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 4-6; | [Y]US5175419 (YAMASHITA MITSUO [JP]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * column 3, lines 41-66 * * column 4, lines 10-15 * * column 5, lines 29-37 *; | [A]US5204526 (YAMASHITA MITSUO [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 1 *; | [A]EP0589195 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 1, lines 1-5 * * column 3, lines 44-47 ** column 7, line 15 - column 9, line 37 *; | [A]WO9910180 (SCITEX CORP LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 3, lines 5-7 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 12 * |