EP1302357 - Method and system for controlling the cruising speed of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/16] | Method and system for controlling the cruising spreed of a vehicle | ||
[2004/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campo, Sebastiano C.R.F. Stà Consortile per Azioni, Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano, Torino / IT | 02 /
Martini, Stefania C.R.F. Stà Consortile per Azioni, Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano, Torino / IT | 03 /
Murdocco, Vincenzo C.R.F. Stà Consortile per Azioni, Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano, Torino / IT | 04 /
Lanfranco, Claudio C.R.F. Stà Consortile per Azioni, Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano, Torino / IT | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2003/16] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02020976.3 | 19.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00905 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010905 | [2003/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302357 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302357 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/04 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B60K31/04 (EP);
B60K31/0008 (EP);
B60K31/0058 (EP);
B60W2530/10 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (EP);
B60W2552/20 (EP);
B60W2555/40 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP);
B60Y2200/14 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle der Geschwindigkeit eines Fahrzeugs | [2003/16] | English: | Method and system for controlling the cruising speed of a vehicle | [2004/31] | French: | Méthode et système pour commander automatiquement la vitesse d'un véhicule à une vitesse de croisière désirée | [2003/16] |
Former [2003/16] | Method and system for controlling the cruising spreed of a vehicle | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2004 | BE | 01.12.2004 | BG | 01.12.2004 | CH | 01.12.2004 | CZ | 01.12.2004 | EE | 01.12.2004 | FI | 01.12.2004 | LI | 01.12.2004 | NL | 01.12.2004 | SK | 01.12.2004 | TR | 01.12.2004 | DK | 01.03.2005 | GR | 01.03.2005 | PT | 01.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
EE | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
SK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BG | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 01.12.2004 | |
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 01.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0729860 (EATON VORAD TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [Y] 21* abstract *; | [Y]US5832400 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,9,15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 8-19 *; | [YA]WO0014435 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 32 * [A] 3; | [XY]US6076036 (PRICE CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,10-14,16-20 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4-6,9,15,21; | [Y]EP1113198 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * claim 2 * |