EP1400715 - Clutch system and holding arrangement to hold at least one clutch in an engaged condition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebert, Angelika Rossbrunnstrasse 18 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
Müller, Ingo Hermann-Löns-Strasse 26 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 03 /
Grosspietsch, Wolfgang Matthias-Grünewald-Ring 20 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | 04 /
Wirth, Thomas Goethestrasse 11 97523 Schwanfeld / DE | 05 /
Heiartz, Markus Sterntalerweg 127 97084 Würzburg / DE | 06 /
Orlamünder, Andreas Hartlaubstrasse 1 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 07 /
Reisser, Wolfgang Hermann-Löns-Strasse 30 97526 Sennfeld / DE | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Jordan, Volker, Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021052.2 | 20.09.2002 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400715 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16D25/12 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
F16D23/14 (EP);
F16D21/06 (EP);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D25/087 (EP);
F16D2021/0607 (EP);
F16D2021/0646 (EP);
F16D2300/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kupplungssystem und Halteanordnung zum Halten wenigstens einer Kupplungsanordnung des Kupplungssystems in einem momentanen oder vorgegebenen Einrückzustand | [2004/13] | English: | Clutch system and holding arrangement to hold at least one clutch in an engaged condition | [2004/13] | French: | Système d'embrayage et dispositif de retenue pour retenir au moins un embrayage dans un condition engagé | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2991863 (GLESMANN HERBERT C, et al) [X] 1-17,19-21,23-25,27-32 * column 3, line 57 - line 65; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2001030099 (FLIEGE HANS [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0019] * |