EP1271801 - Global channel power control to minimize spillover in a wireless communication environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozluturk, Fatih M. 70 Willowdale Avenue Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021057.1 | 11.02.1998 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US19970797989 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: US 797989 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271801 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271801 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
H04W52/343 (EP);
H04W52/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/01] | Title | German: | Globalkanal -Leistungsregelung zur minimierung des Überlaufs in einer schnurlosen Kommunikationsumgebung | [2003/01] | English: | Global channel power control to minimize spillover in a wireless communication environment | [2003/01] | French: | Regulation de la puissance d'emission d'une voie commune permettant de minimiser le depassement de capacité dans un environement de communications sans fil | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98910006.0 / EP0966802 | Divisional application(s) | EP03008733.2 / EP1333594 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0399610 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,13,21,30,40,50,56,62 * column 2, line 24 - line 38 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 14 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 2 *; | [A]WO9533313 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,13,21,30,40,50,56,62 * abstract *; page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 7 *; | [A]US5507018 (SEPPALAE SEPPO [FI]) [A] 1,13,21,30,40,50,56,62 * abstract *; column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 13 * * figure 4 *; | [XA]WO9631013 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 30,31,40,41,50,51,56,57,62,63 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 14 - line 24 * * page 10, line 26 - line 37 * * page 19, line 3 - line 7 * * page 20, line 20 - line 23 * * page 21, line 11 - page 23, line 5 * * figure 5; claims 1,15 * [A] 1,13,21; | [A]WO9702665 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1,13,21,30,40,50,56,62 * abstract *; page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 10 * * page 8, line 22 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 22 - page 10, line 7 ** figures 1,2,5; claim 1 * |