EP1300617 - Valve device for a pressure container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSOL-TECHNIK LINDAL GMBH Industriestrasse 13 D-23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lilienthal, Hans Peter Wulfsdal 35 22587 Hamburg / DE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/15] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021080.3 | 21.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | DE2001216336U | 05.10.2001 Original published format: DE 20116336 U | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300617 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300617 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
F16K1/302 (EP,US);
F16K15/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/15] | Title | German: | Ventilanordnung für einen unter Druck stehenden Fluidbehälter | [2003/15] | English: | Valve device for a pressure container | [2003/15] | French: | Dispositif de soupape pour un récipient sous pression | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/48] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5014887 (KOPP VOLKER [CH]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 44 - line 49; figure 2 *; | [X]WO9842592 (LINDAL VALVE CO LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 4, paragraph 4; figure 6 *; | [A]US5927563 (KELLNER KLAUS [DE]) | by applicant | DE19710541 |