EP1295533 - Sweetener and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states DAINIPPON INK AND CHEMICALS, INC. 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitazume, Masato 6-37-2, Asumigaoka, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Katabami, Tadashi 7-13-19, Maebaranishi Hunabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/13] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021212.2 | 18.09.2002 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | JP20010289166 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001289166 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1295533 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295533 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23L2/60 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (KR);
A23F5/40 (EP,US);
A23L27/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Süssungsmittel und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2003/13] | English: | Sweetener and process for producing the same | [2003/13] | French: | Edulcorant et procédé pour sa préparation | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 08.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02131592 ; | [AD]JPS5894367 ; | [A]KR940004526B ; | [A]JPH01254696 ; | [A]US4590160 (NISHIHASHI HIDEJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900807), vol. 014, no. 363, Database accession no. (C - 0746), & JP02131592 A 19900521 (HOKKAIDO TOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 5,8 * abstract * | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 28, Database accession no. 1983-708567, XP002227850 & JPS5894367 A 19830604 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM KK) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 10, Database accession no. 1996-095732, XP002227851 & KR940004526B B1 19940525 (MIWON CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 47, Database accession no. 1989-343267, XP002227855 & JPH01254696 A 19891011 (MARUZEN KASEI CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |