EP1298672 - Flash memory rewrite circuit, semiconductor integrated circuit, memory card having the semiconductor integrated circuit thereof, method of rewriting flash memory and flash memory rewriting program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Shuzo, Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021375.7 | 24.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | JP20010294204 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001294204 | [2003/24] |
Former [2003/14] | JP20010294024 | 26.09.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298672 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298672 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/10 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G11C16/105 (EP,US);
G11C16/06 (KR);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/102 (EP,US);
G11C16/3454 (EP,US);
G11C16/3459 (EP,US);
G11C2216/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/39] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flash-Speicher Umschreibungsschaltung, integrierte Halbleiterschaltung, Speicherkarte mit diesem integrierte Halbleiterschaltung, Verfahren zur Datenumschreibung auf einem Flash-Speicher und Program zur Datenumschreibung auf einem Flash-Speicher | [2003/14] | English: | Flash memory rewrite circuit, semiconductor integrated circuit, memory card having the semiconductor integrated circuit thereof, method of rewriting flash memory and flash memory rewriting program | [2003/14] | French: | Circuit de réécriture de mémoire flash, circuit intégré à semiconducteurs, carte de mémoire ayant ce circuit intégré à semiconducteurs, méthode de réécriture de mémoire flash et programme de réécriture de mémoire flash | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/40] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0557968 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11-13,15-17,19,20,24* column 3, line 44 - line 54 *; | [XY]US5305276 (UENOYAMA HIROMI [JP]) [X] 1,4,7,10,14,18,21-23 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 65; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11-13,15-17,19,20,24; | [X]EP0715313 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,10,14,18,21-23 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5844845 (TAHARA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11-13,15-17,19,20,24 * column 19, line 10 - line 15 * |