EP1302279 - Rotating machine element and method to detect the position of at least one indicator of such a rotating machine element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Heller Maschinenfabrik GmbH Neuffener Strasse 54 D-72622 Nürtingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Gebr. Heller Maschinenfabrik GmbH Neuffener Strasse 54 D-72622 Nürtingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faigle, Bernd Hans Robert-Mayer-Strasse 29 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021416.9 | 25.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | DE2001150710 | 13.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150710 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302279 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B23Q17/003 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Rotierendes Maschinenelement sowie Verfahren zur Erfassung von Positionswerten von mindestens einem Funktionsträger eines solchen rotierenden Machinenelementes | [2003/16] | English: | Rotating machine element and method to detect the position of at least one indicator of such a rotating machine element | [2003/16] | French: | Elément rotatif de machine et procédé de détection de la position d'au moins un indicateur d'un tel élément rotatif de machine | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0294547 (SMW SPANNEINRICHTUNGEN [DE]) [X] 1-44 * the whole document *; | [A]US5050135 (PAI RAMDAS M [US], et al) [A] 26-44 * column 1, line 5 - line 49 ** abstract *; | [X]WO0056489 (LIND FINANCE & DEV AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-44 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 17 *; | [X]DE10049262 (SMC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-44 * the whole document * |