EP1298498 - Toner and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizoe, Kiyoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takiguchi, Tsuyoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Arahira, Fumihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ito, Masanori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021451.6 | 25.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | JP20010299292 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299292 | JP20010299293 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299293 | JP20020009816 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002009816 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298498 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298498 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298498 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/097, G03G9/08 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G03G13/09 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (KR);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/0825 (EP,US);
G03G9/0827 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US);
G03G2215/021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/50] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Toner und Bildaufzeichnungsmethode | [2003/14] | English: | Toner and image forming method | [2003/14] | French: | Toner et méthode de formation d'images | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.07.2005 | LI | 06.07.2005 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63254465 ; | [A]US6171747 (SUGIZAKI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,12,13 * claims 1,6,7 * * column 16, line 20 - column 17, line 27 ** column 18, lines 13-18 *; | [A]EP1128224 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-67 * paragraphs [0213] , [0220] , [0440] , [0447] , [0580] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890215), vol. 013, no. 066, Database accession no. (P - 828), & JP63254465 A 19881021 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |