EP1298604 - Gaming machines with directed sounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Game Technology 9295 Prototype Drive Reno, Nevada 89511 / US | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilder, Richard L. 8960 Jedediah Smith Drive Sparks (89436), Nevada / US | 02 /
Wells, William R. 4450 Rio Encantado Lane Reno (89502), Nevada / US | 03 /
Mattice, Harold 1271 Bolivia Way Gardnerville (89410), Nevada / US | 04 /
Griswold, Chauncey W. 1160 Monroe Court Reno (89509), Nevada / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021457.3 | 25.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | US20010966860 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 966860 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298604 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298604 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G07F17/3202 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/14] | Title | German: | Spielautomaten mit ausgerichteten Geräuschen | [2003/14] | English: | Gaming machines with directed sounds | [2003/14] | French: | Machine à sous avec des sons dirigés | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2007 | 12.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/27] | 06.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 15.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000181678 ; | [X]JPH1127774 ; | [A]US4823908 (TANAKA TSUNEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-29* abstract *; | [X]EP1117076 (NCR INT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,12-15,17,19-22,24,26-29 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000181678 A 20000630 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * figures 15-29 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0095] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11027774 A 19990129 (MK SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * figure 3 * |