EP1349227 - Air breathing direct methanol fuel cell pack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [2012/16] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Kyoung Hwan 101-303 Daehan Daewoo Apt. 270 Seryu 1-dong Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Chang, Hyuk 503-1304 Samhwan Apt. 301 Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2012/16] |
Former [2003/40] | 01 /
Choi, Kyoung Hwan 101-303 Daehan Daewoo Apt., 270 Seryu 1-dong Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
02 /
Chang, Hyuk 503-1304 Samhwan Apt., 301 Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/40] | Patentanwälte, Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021512.5 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | KR20020015116 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: KR 2002015116 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1349227 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1349227 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349227 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M8/04 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H01M8/1009 (EP,US);
H01G9/00 (KR);
H01M8/0258 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
H01M8/241 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2483 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0232 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/40] | H01M8/10, H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/27] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Direkt-Methanol-Brennstoffzellenpackung mit Luftatmung | [2003/40] | English: | Air breathing direct methanol fuel cell pack | [2003/40] | French: | Assemblage de piles à combustible au méthanol-air | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 14.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000268835 ; | [Y]US5861221 (LEDJEFF KONSTANTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 2-4,9 * column 8, line 21 - column 8, line 56; figure 3 *; | [A]WO0145189 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1,2,9 * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 15 - page 4, line 28 ** page 5, line 14 - page 5, line 23; figures 1,5 *; | [X]US6268077 (KELLEY RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1134830 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-4,9 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 54 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 36 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 3; figures 3,10,11; claims 1,11,12 *; | [A]WO0197314 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 24 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 6; figures 1,4; claims 1,6 *; | [E]WO02099916 (POLYFUEL INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] , [0073] , [0089] - [0092]; figures 2,8,9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000268835 A 20000929 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US6268077 | EP1134830 |