EP1297737 - Shredder device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferri S.rl. Via Govoni, 30 44030 Tamara (Ferrara) / IT | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferri, Sandro Via Borsari, 57 44100 Ferrara / IT | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Studio Ing. Giampaolo Agazzani Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. & Studio Ing. Giampaolo Agazzani, Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 02021581.0 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | IT2001BO00596 | 27.09.2001 Original published format: IT BO20010596 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1297737 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/00, A01G23/06, A01G3/053, A01D34/00, A01D34/86 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A01D34/535 (EP);
A01B33/103 (EP);
A01G23/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Shredder | [2003/14] | English: | Shredder device | [2003/14] | French: | Déchiqueteur | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 16.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1100369 (INT HARVESTER CO) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB895159 (MOTT CORP) [A] 1 * page 1, line 78 - line 85; figure - *; | [A]FR1468662 (MOTT CORP) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB1223042 (INT HARVESTER CO [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8704846U (AMAZONEN-WERKE H. DREYER GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1* figure - * |