EP1302451 - Method for the interior reflective coating of glass tubes, in particular for solar collectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2003/16] | For:AT
BE
CH
LI
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
CZ
EE
BG
SK
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
IE
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLAS Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tratzky, Stephan, Dr. Königsberger Strasse 1a 92660 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Dotzler, Heinz Egerstrasse 5 95643 Tirschenreuth / DE | 03 /
Müller, Matthias Martin-Luther-Strasse 12 95666 Mitterteich / DE | 04 /
Pfeifer, Joachim, Dr. Kösseinestrasse 7 95448 Bayreuth / DE | 05 /
Siller, Michael Zirkenreuth 5 95666 Leonberg / DE | 06 /
Schulz, Leonid Gartenstrasse 10 95666 Mitterteich / DE | 07 /
Haas, Gottfried Dr.-Hauer-Weg 7 95643 Tirschenreuth / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022054.7 | 02.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | DE2001154402 | 10.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10154402 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302451 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302451 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/10, F24J2/05 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
C03C17/10 (EP,US);
C03C17/004 (EP,US);
F24S23/82 (EP,US);
C03C2218/31 (EP,US);
C03C2218/33 (EP,US);
C03C2218/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Innenverspiegeln von Glasrohren, insbesondere für Sonnenkollektoren | [2003/16] | English: | Method for the interior reflective coating of glass tubes, in particular for solar collectors | [2003/16] | French: | Méthode de revêtement miroir intérieur de tubes en verre, en particulier pour collecteurs solaires | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 29.12.2004 | CZ | 29.12.2004 | EE | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | FR | 29.12.2004 | IE | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | SK | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | ES | 09.04.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
EE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
IT | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
EE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
FR | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
SK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
CZ | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60151253 ; | [A]US4579107 (DEAKIN DAVID [US]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]GB2213257 (VALIZADEH HOSSEIN) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 24 - line 31; claim - *; | [A]EP0665304 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851212), vol. 009, no. 317, Database accession no. (C - 319), & JP60151253 A 19850809 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |