EP1300705 - Optical multiplexer/demultiplexer and adjustment method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takushima, Michiko, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 02 /
Suganuma, Hiroshi, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 03 /
Sano, Tomomi, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 04 /
Shigehara, Masakazu, Yokohama Works Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022239.4 | 02.10.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010306596 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001306596 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300705 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300705 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/34 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G02B6/29307 (EP,US);
G02B6/272 (EP,US);
G02B6/2931 (EP,US);
G02B6/29313 (EP,US);
G02B6/2938 (EP,US);
G02B6/29395 (EP,US);
G02B6/2773 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | G02B6/293 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/02] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Multiplexer/Demultiplexer und Abstimmverfahren | [2003/15] | English: | Optical multiplexer/demultiplexer and adjustment method | [2003/15] | French: | Multiplexeur/Démultiplexeur optique et méthode d'ajustement | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5594744 (LEFEVRE HERVE [FR], et al) [Y] 11,20* column 6, line 7 - line 28; figure 9 *; | [X]US5917625 (OGUSU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 21, line 56 - column 22, line 10; figure 27 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 6 *; | [X]EP1030195 (PHOTONETICS [FR]) [X] 1,2,11-18,20 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 11; figures 5,7,8 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 *; | [Y]EP1031825 (ANDO ELECTRIC [JP]) [Y] 8,10,19 * equation i *; column 7, line 4 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [XY] - CHAMBERLIN G R ET AL, "DESIGNS FOR HIGH CHANNEL DENSITY SINGLE-MODE WAVELENGTH-DIVISION-MULTIPLEXERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19870817), vol. 839, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 60 - 66, XP000603504 [X] 1,2,6 * page 61, column 1 - page 62, column 1; figure 2 * * page 62, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 63, column 2 * [Y] 11,20,8,10,19 |