EP1302375 - Electronic automobile anti-theft apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI RIKA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho 260, Toyota 3-chome, Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Masaki K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 02 /
Nagae, Toshihiro K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 03 /
Yoshino, Masaki K.K. Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho, 3-260, Toyota Ohguchi-cho, Niwa-gun, Aichi 480-0195 / JP | 04 /
Kishida, Shinji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Iwamoto, Koji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Asahi, Toshio Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022341.8 | 08.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010311386 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001311386 | JP20010311389 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001311389 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302375 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302375 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302375 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/02, F16H59/10 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B60R25/02153 (EP,US);
B60R25/02142 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | B60R25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/48] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Fahrzeugdiebstahlsicherung | [2003/16] | English: | Electronic automobile anti-theft apparatus | [2003/16] | French: | Dispositif antivol électronique pour véhicules | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10244853 ; | [X]JPH1059132 ; | [X]WO9009649 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD USA [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0495667 (GRAND HAVEN STAMPED PROD [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,11-19* abstract *; | [X]US6059687 (DURIEUX JEAN MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-14,16-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 3 *; | [X]WO0123229 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, line L - page 5, line 8 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, line 7 - line 18 * * page 9, line 4 - line 10 *; | [Y]DE19948969 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,11-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 26 * * column 2, line 35 - line 40 * * column 2, line 47 - line 62 * * column 3, line 44 - line 49 * * column 4, line 10 - line 28 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10244853 A 19980914 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1-6,11-14,16-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 7-10,15 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10059132 A 19980303 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,11-14,16-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * | Examination | JPS5914555 | EP1359068 | EP1359070 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840511), vol. 0081, & JP59014555 A 19840125 (KOKUSAN KINZOKU KOGYO KK) |