EP1314689 - Process for the production of synthesis gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lurgi AG Lurgiallee 5 60295 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlichting, Holger Postdamer Strasse 1 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Liebner, Waldemar Hohemarkstrasse 136 61440 Oberursel / DE | 03 /
Morgenroth, Rainer Alte Grenzstrasse 19a 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 04 /
Erdmann, Christoph Zaunkönigweg 35 65719 Hofheim / DE | 05 /
Grünfelder, Gerd Johann Holzhäuserstrasse 4 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 06 /
Fellner, Helmut Hesselbergstrasse 6 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 07 /
Hofmockel, Jürgen Rückertstrasse 36 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/22] | Application number, filing date | 02022417.6 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | DE2001156980 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156980 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314689 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314689 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/36 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
C01B3/36 (EP,US);
F23D11/102 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0255 (EP,US);
C01B2203/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/40] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Synthesegas | [2003/22] | English: | Process for the production of synthesis gas | [2003/22] | French: | Procédé de production de gaz de synthèse | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/05] | 11.08.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/05] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4400179 (MARION CHARLES P [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * column 1, line 13 - line 17 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 32 * * column 5, line 6 - line 17 * * column 5, line 56 - line 61 * * column 6, line 34 - line 66 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 15 * * column 9, line 36 - line 45 * * column 9, line 54 - line 58 * [A] 1; | [DA]US4443230 (STELLACCIO ROBERT J [US]) [DA] 1-7 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 1, line 30 - line 39 * * column 3, line 18 - line 27 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 29 - line 34 * * column 4, line 45 - line 51 * * column 5, line 7 - line 19 * * column 8, line 10 - line 17 ** column 8, line 22 - line 26 *; | [XY]EP1016705 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1,9-12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-7 |