EP1340691 - Clip-on package for cans and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanfried-Druck Kalden GmbH Vor dem Untertor 37281 Wanfried / DE | [2003/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mann, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Vor dem Untertor 1 37281 Wanfried / DE | [2003/36] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried, Dipl.-Phys. Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022513.2 | 07.10.2002 | [2003/36] | Priority number, date | DE2002203017U | 26.02.2002 Original published format: DE 20203017 U | [2003/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1340691 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/42, B65B17/02 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
B65D71/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/36] | Title | German: | Verpackungskörper für Dosen für formschlüssiges Einklippen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2003/36] | English: | Clip-on package for cans and method for production thereof | [2003/36] | French: | Emballage encliquetable pour des canettes et procedé de fabrication | [2003/36] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2331038 (MELLER REGINALD B) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1214136 (CONTINENTAL CAN CO) [A] 14,15* the whole document *; | [XA]US3653503 (ARNESON EDWIN L) [X] 1-6,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [A]EP0428852 (WANFRIED DRUCK KALDEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 14,15 * abstract *; | [X]EP0806372 (RIVERWOOD INT CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4034069 | DE29813672U |