EP1410741 - Armrest for a chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedus Stoll AG Brückenstrasse 15 79761 Waldshut / DE | [2004/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jehle, Herbert Degenauerstrasse 27 79793 Wutöschingen / DE | 02 /
Tritschler, Alexander Maria-Theresia-Strasse 16 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Pöpper, Evamaria Patentanwältin Ziegelfeldstrasse 11a 79761 Waldshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Pöpper, Evamaria, Dr. Patentanwältin, Ziegelfeldstrasse 11a 79761 Waldshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022849.0 | 14.10.2002 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410741 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/54 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A47C7/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/02] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Armlehne für einen Stuhl | [2004/17] | English: | Armrest for a chair | [2004/17] | French: | Accoudoir pour une chaise | [2004/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]DE3824804 (DAIMLER-BENZ AG) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 8 - line 20; figure 2 * * column 1, line 60 - line 62 *[Y] 4,2; | [XY]US5924769 (KAO HSIN-LIN [TW]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [Y] 2,4 |