EP1302436 - Outrigger mounting structure of loading and unloading vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [2011/07] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hideki, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. General Machinery & Special Vehicle HQ, 3000, Tana Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 229-1193 / JP | 02 /
Kito, Yuji, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. General Machinery & Special Vehicle HQ, 3000, Tana Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 229-1193 / JP | 03 /
Mizunuma, Wataru, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. General Machinery & Special Vehicle HQ, 3000, Tana Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 229-1193 / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02022974.6 | 14.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010316789 | 15.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001316789 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302436 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302436 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1302436 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/80, B60S9/12 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B66C23/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT [2004/02] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auslegerbefestigungsstruktur eines Ladefahrzeugs | [2003/16] | English: | Outrigger mounting structure of loading and unloading vehicle | [2003/16] | French: | Structure de montage des pieds de sustention d'un véhicule de chargement et décharchement | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 04.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Gottwald Port Technology GmbH Forststrasse 16 40597 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Moser, Jörg Michael, et al, et al Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2005
21.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE Gottwald Port Technology GmbH Forststrasse 16 40597 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Moser, Jörg Michael, et al, et al Moser & Götze Patentanwälte Rosastrasse 6 A 45130 Essen / DE | 04.11.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.12.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.01.2008 | Appeal received No. T0168/08 | 01.04.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2653829 (SHEEHAN WILLIAM M) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-4,7-9 *; | [X]US3064825 (THOMAS JAMES G) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-3,5,6 *; | [X]EP0661196 (SCHWING GMBH F [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]US2002070188 (BAUER MARTIN [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,4* page 2; figures 1,2 * | Opposition | DE29719953U | DE4311662 | - DEMAG, IMMINGHAM, (20010828), no. 826526 |