EP1314450 - Circuit for detecting cardiac rhythm abnormalities by analyzing time differences between unipolar signals from a lead with a multi-electrode tip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/22] | Method and circuit for detecting cardiac rhythm abnormalities by analyzing time differences between unipolar signals from a lead with a multi-electrode tip | ||
[2007/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | [2007/50] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Björling, Anders Arrendevägen 11, 2tr 175 54 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
Hedberg, Sven-Erik Odonstigen 5 196 32 Kungsängen / SE | 03 /
Lindegren, Ulf Dalgardsvägan 34 121 33 Enskede / SE | 04 /
Lindgren, Anders Sportvägen 24 187 35 Täby / SE | [2003/22] | Application number, filing date | 02023076.9 | 17.10.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010995198 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: US 995198 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314450 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314450 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314450 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
A61N1/3622 (EP,US);
A61N1/3956 (EP,US);
Y10S128/923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IE, IT, LI [2005/38] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Detektion von Anomalien des Herzrhythmus durch Analyse von Zeitunterschieden zwischen monopolaren Signalen einer Leitung mit einer Multielektroden-Spitze | [2007/22] | English: | Circuit for detecting cardiac rhythm abnormalities by analyzing time differences between unipolar signals from a lead with a multi-electrode tip | [2007/22] | French: | Circuit de détection d'anomalies du rythme cardiaque par analyse d'intervalles de temps entre des signaux unipolaires d'une sonde munie d'une extrémité avec plusieurs électrodes | [2007/22] |
Former [2003/22] | Verfahren und Schaltung zur Detektion von Anomalien des Herzrhythmus durch Analyse von Zeitunterschieden zwischen monopolaren Signalen einer Leitung mit einer Multielektroden-Spitze | ||
Former [2003/22] | Method and circuit for detecting cardiac rhythm abnormalities by analyzing time differences between unipolar signals from a lead with a multi-electrode tip | ||
Former [2003/22] | Procédé et circuit de détection d'anomalies du rythme cardiaque par analyse d'intervalles de temps entre des signaux unipolaires d'une sonde munie d'une extrémité avec plusieurs électrodes | Examination procedure | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.04.2007 | 23.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6152882 (PRUTCHI DAVID [US]) [X] 22-25,27-31,39-42,44-48 * column 22, line 55 - column 24, line 48; figures 12,14 * * column 9, lines 33-37; figure 22B * [Y] 32-38,49-55; | [A]US6308095 (HSU WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 22-25,27-31,40,42,44-48 * column 9, lines 53-58; figures 2,3,5 * * column 11, lines 26-64 * * column 22, line 58 - column 23, line 7 *; | [A]EP0571797 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [A] 28,45 * page 3, lines 46-50; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9712548 (CORDIS WEBSTER INC [US]) [A] 22-31,39-48 * page 2, lines 27-33; figures 5,6,16 *; | [A]US5366487 (ADAMS THEODORE P [US], et al) [A] 25,42 * column 7, lines 14-37 *; | [Y]US6266554 (HSU WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 32-38,49-55 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 41 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 21 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 62 * * column 9, lines 51-65 * * column 10, lines 51-65; figures 3,5,6 * * column 14, lines 51-55 *; | [A]US5273049 (STEINHAUS BRUCE M [US], et al) [A] 32-38,49-55 * column 5, lines 1-54 * * column 17, line 23 - column 18, line 56; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1123716 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [A] 32-38,49-55 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | US5306292 |