EP1312773 - System for compensating the phase deviation of an adjustable camshaft and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karcher, Rolf Palmstrasse 8 74172 Necharsulm / DE | 02 /
Baur, Gerhard Trollingerweg 17 74357 Bönningheim / DE | [2003/21] | Application number, filing date | 02023256.7 | 17.10.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | DE2001156510 | 16.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156510 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312773 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312773 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312773 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F02D13/08 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
F01L1/34 (EP);
F01L2001/34443 (EP);
F01L2800/00 (EP);
F01L2800/04 (EP);
F01L2800/05 (EP);
F01L2820/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/17] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Beheben der Abweichung einer verstellbaren Nockenwelle und Verfahren | [2003/21] | English: | System for compensating the phase deviation of an adjustable camshaft and corresponding method | [2003/21] | French: | Système pour compenser l'erreur de déphasage d'un arbre à cames à déphasage variable et méthode correspondante | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4340614 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,20,21 * column W *; | [DA]DE4433299 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,20,21 * column W *; | [A]US5623902 (NUSSER CLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,20,21* column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 14; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE10002352 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1,20,21 * column W *; | [A]DE10054101 (UNISIA JECS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,20,21 * column 1, line 16 - column 1, line 36 * |