EP1314455 - Transportable exercise apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lightyear Ltd. Sarsfield House, Sarsfield Road Wilton Cork / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Lightyear Ltd. Sarsfield House, Sarsfield Road Wilton, Cork / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlüter, Martin Horse Island Hull, Co. Cork / IE | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | [2009/36] |
Former [2003/22] | Jabbusch, Matthias, et al Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023258.3 | 17.10.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010990732 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 990732 | [2003/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1314455 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/055, A63B21/02 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
A63B21/0552 (EP,US);
A63B21/0004 (EP,US);
A63B21/00043 (EP,US);
A63B21/154 (EP,US);
A63B21/0442 (EP,US);
A63B21/0555 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/08] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Transportable Krafttrainings-Vorrichtung | [2003/22] | English: | Transportable exercise apparatus | [2003/22] | French: | Appareil d'entraînement transportable | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE541348 (HENRI DUPONT) [DY] 9,13 * page 1, line 36 - line 38 ** page 1, line 38 - line 43 *; | [XY]US4779867 (HINDS ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [Y] 9,12,13; | [Y]US5720700 (BUONI NICK J [US], et al) [Y] 12 * figure 11A * | by applicant | DE541348 |