EP1306076 - Use of high-purity phenylsilsesquioxane liquids for the preparation of cosmetic and pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legrow, Gary E. 13707 SW 1st Lane Newberry, Florida 32669 / US | 02 /
Terry, W. Leonard, Jr. 5922 NW 72nd Street Gainesville, Florida 32653 / US | 03 /
Figueroa, Ray 4201 North Ocean Drive,Apt. 304 Hollywood, Florida 33019 / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Mikulecky, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023439.9 | 19.10.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | US20010002709 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: US 2709 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1306076 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1306076 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A61K9/20 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,US);
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/40] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von hochgereinigten flüssigen Phenylsilsesquioxanen für die Zubereitung von kosmetischen und pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen | [2003/18] | English: | Use of high-purity phenylsilsesquioxane liquids for the preparation of cosmetic and pharmaceutical compositions | [2003/18] | French: | Utilisation de phenylsilsesquioxanes de grande pureté pour la préparation de compositions cosmétiques et pharmaceutiques | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 12.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5039518 (BARONE SALVATORE J [US], et al) [A] 1-6* examples 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5531986 (SHEVADE MAKARAND [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 1-5; claims 1,5 *; | [X]US5679822 (LEGROW GARY E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 54-64; claims 1-17 * * column 2, lines 50-67 * * column 3, lines 1-47 *; | [A]US5885559 (LEE WILSON [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5932231 (LEGROW GARY E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5989532 (HANING LINDA J [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples I,II; claim 1 * |