EP1310612 - Supporting structure for wall facing plates in building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/20] | Supporting structure for wall facing plates in building, assembly method and tool | ||
[2008/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dallera, Franco Via Cavour, 3 28011 Armeno (No) / IT | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Petruzziello, Aldo Racheli & C. S p A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02023600.6 | 23.10.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02394 | 13.11.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012394 | [2003/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310612 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1310612 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1310612 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04F21/00 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
E04F21/00 (EP);
E04F13/0808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Abstützkonstruktion für Wandverkleidungsplatten eines Gebäudes | [2008/28] | English: | Supporting structure for wall facing plates in building | [2008/28] | French: | Structure de support pour panneaux de revêtement de parois de bâtiment | [2008/28] |
Former [2003/20] | Abstützkonstruktion für Wandverkleidungsplatten eines Gebäudes, Verfahren zum Zusammenbau und Werkzeug | ||
Former [2003/20] | Supporting structure for wall facing plates in building, assembly method and tool | ||
Former [2003/20] | Structure de support pour panneaux de revêtement de parois de bâtiment, méthode d'assemblage et outil | Examination procedure | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7009057U (OSTERLOH FA FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3561182 (MADL JOSEPH JR) [A] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4063393 (TOTI ANDREW J) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 13 - column 14, line 63; figures 1-20 *; | [A]CH659679 (AUGUST BRAENDLI) [A] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * | Examination | GB1153693 |