EP1312810 - Piston/cylinder unit with anti-rotation between piston and rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyco Pacoma GmbH Königsberger Strasse 12 37269 Eschwege / DE | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herwig, Karl-Wilhelm Steinstrasse 6 37242 Bad Sooden-Allendorf / DE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023850.7 | 24.10.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | DE2001156504 | 16.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156504 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312810 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312810 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
F15B15/1447 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | Kolben/Zylinder-Einheit mit einer Drehsicherung zwichen Kolben und Kolbenstange | [2003/21] | English: | Piston/cylinder unit with anti-rotation between piston and rod | [2003/21] | French: | Unité piston/cylindre avec blocage en rotation entre le piston et la tige | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.04.2004 | CY | 14.04.2004 | CZ | 14.04.2004 | EE | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | IE | 14.04.2004 | SK | 14.04.2004 | TR | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | AT | 24.10.2004 | LU | 24.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/10] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CY | 14.04.2004 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
EE | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
LU | 24.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2007/03] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
EE | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 24.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 14.04.2004 | |
CZ | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | CZ | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CZ | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | CZ | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
SK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2987046 (ATHERTON NEIL F) [A] 1* column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 18 *; | [AD]US3293993 (LANMAN ROBERT W) [AD] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 3; figure - *; | [A]FR2420677 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 37; figures 3,4,7 *; | [A]DE2937412 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2755739 (CHAPEL [FR]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * page 1; figure - * |