EP1306870 - Field emission-type electron source and method of biasing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/08] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komoda, Takuya Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
Ichihara, Tsutomu Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
Aizawa, Koichi Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
Honda, Yoshiaki Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 05 /
Watabe, Yoshifumi Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 06 /
Hatai, Takashi Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 07 /
Takegawa, Yoshiyuki Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 08 /
Baba, Toru Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02023937.2 | 25.10.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | JP20010331470 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001331470 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1306870 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1306870 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1306870 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/22, H01J1/312 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G09G3/22 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01J1/30 (KR);
H01J1/312 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0254 (EP,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/18] | H01J1/312 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [2005/41] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronenquelle des Feldemissionstyps und Verfahren zum Anlegen einer Vorspannung | [2003/18] | English: | Field emission-type electron source and method of biasing the same | [2003/18] | French: | Source d'électrons à émission de champ et procédé de polarisation | [2010/01] |
Former [2003/18] | Source d'électrons du type a émission de champ et procédé de polarisation | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 26.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SK, TR | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5136212 (EGUCHI KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claim 15 *; | [AD]JPH07226146 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1 *abstract*; | [AD]JPH1195716 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1 *abstract*; | [X]WO9948123 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,21,22 *abstract*; | [PX]US6320324 (KUSUNOKI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,21,22* column 10, line 19 - column 12 * |