EP1413255 - Absorbable surgical sealing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS AB Palmbladsgatan 10 754 50 Uppsala / SE | [2004/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egnelöv, Por Nannas väg 6 75440 Uppsala / SE | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Lindgren, Anders, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 02023955.4 | 25.10.2002 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413255 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413255 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP);
A61B2017/00659 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | Resorbierbare, medizinische Vorrichtung zur chirurgischen Abdichtung | [2009/35] | English: | Absorbable surgical sealing device | [2004/18] | French: | Dispositif résorbable de fermeture des perforations chirurgicales | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/18] | Resorbiarbare, medizinische Vorrichtung zur chirurgischen Abdichtung | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE20009815U (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,18,19,21,24 * figures 2,3; claim 4 * [Y] 4,5,8,12-14,16,17,20,22,23,25-27; | [DY]EP1169968 (RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS [SE]) [DY] 4,5,8,12-14,16,17,20,22,23,25-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US6383201 (DONG TENNISON S [US]) [X] 1,12* figures 3-5 * | by applicant | US5350399 | EP1169968 |