EP1308340 - Device and method for vehicle cruise control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2006/27] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states ADAM OPEL AG 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehl, Peter G., Dipl.-Ing. Waldstrasse 9A 64521 Gross-Gerau / DE | 02 /
Reuter, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Am Steinberg 1 55278 Dalheim / DE | [2003/19] | Application number, filing date | 02024005.7 | 26.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE2001154385 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154385 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308340 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308340 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308340 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B60K31/042 (EP);
B60W30/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Geschwindigkeitssteuerung bei einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/19] | English: | Device and method for vehicle cruise control | [2003/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil de régulation de vitesse pour un véhicule | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 15.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05003207.7 / EP1533172 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH11189068 ; | [X]US4858135 (CLISH FRANK [GB], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 33 - line 48 * * column 8, line 9 - line 29 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 7 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE19509494 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 5 * column 4, line 29 - line 47 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5665026 (LINDEN THOMAS [DE]) [X] 5 * column 7, line 29 - line 51 * * column 12, line 42 - column 13, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5774820 (LINDEN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 5* column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 5 *; | [A]DE19654218 (ELSON PRODUKTIONS UND HANDELS [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 46 *; | [A]US5794735 (SIGL ALFRED [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19947313 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 5, line 24 - line 33 * * column 7, line 16 - line 36 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11189068 A 19990713 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0024] - [0026] - [0030] - [0034] * [Y] 2-4 |