EP1308122 - Device for the picture-providing diagnosis of tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [2006/31] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Bernd Claus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Kriegsstrasse 81 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Goll, Thomas Pforzheimer Strasse 20 75438 Knittlingen / DE | 03 /
Pereira-Delgado, Nicolas Billensbacher Weg 4 75433 Maulbronn / DE | 04 /
Eidner, Philipp Pfarrer-Kempf-Strasse 11 75015 Bretten-Büchig / DE | 05 /
Müller, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eichholzstrasse 15 75015 Bretten-Diedelsheim / DE | 06 /
Schmidt, Olaf, Dipl.-Ing. Mönchsbergstrasse 4 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 07 /
Wagniéres, Georges, Dr. Chemin de Plantaz 56 1095 Lutry / CH | 08 /
Glanzmann, Thomas, Dr. Hasenrainstrasse 69 4102 Binningen / CH | 09 /
van den Bergh, Hubert, Prof. Dr. Rue du Centre 44a 1025 St. Sulpice / CH | 10 /
Gabrecht, Tanja Viebahnstrasse 7 58739 Wickede / DE | [2003/21] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
Weber, Bernd Claus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Kriegsstrasse 81 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
Goll, Thomas Pforzheimer Strasse 20 75438 Knittlingen / DE | |||
03 /
Pereira-Delgado, Nicolas Billensbacher Weg 4 75433 Maulbronn / DE | |||
04 /
Eidner, Philipp Pfarrer-Kempf-Strasse 11 75015 Bretten-Büchig / DE | |||
05 /
Müller, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eichholzstrasse 15 75015 Bretten-Diedelsheim / DE | |||
06 /
Schmidt, Olaf, Dipl.-Ing. Mönchsbergstrasse 4 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | |||
07 /
Wagniéres, Georges, Dr. Chaussee de la Brume 6 1110 Morges / CH | |||
08 /
Glanzmann, Thomas, Dr. Hasenrainstrasse 69 4102 Binningen / CH | |||
09 /
an den Bergh, Hubert, Prof. Dr. La Bergerie 1376 Goumoens la Ville / CH | |||
10 /
Gabrecht, Tanja Viebahnstrasse 7 58739 Wickede / DE | Representative(s) | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Hemmer, Arnd, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann, Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Wilcken, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 02024140.2 | 30.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | DE20011053900 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10153900 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308122 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308122 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
A61B1/00186 (EP);
A61B1/043 (EP);
A61B1/0638 (EP);
A61B1/0646 (EP);
A61B1/0655 (EP);
A61B5/0071 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/05] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur bildgebenden Diagnose von Gewebe | [2003/19] | English: | Device for the picture-providing diagnosis of tissue | [2003/19] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie pour le diagnostic tissulaire | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5590660 (MACAULAY CALUM [CA], et al); | [A]US5772580 (UTSUI TETSUYA [JP], et al); | [A]WO0042910 (NEWTON LAB INC [US], et al) [A] * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 17 * * page 18, line 12 - page 18, line 29; figure 8 *; | [A]US6110106 (MACKINNON NICHOLAS B [CA], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column 1, line 26 - column 1, line 42 * * column 3, line 18 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 22 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 7 * * column 12, line 2 - column 12, line 5 * * column 9, line 39 - column 9, line 42 *; | [A]WO0145557 (XILLIX TECHNOLOGIES CORP [CA], et al); | [PX]US2002147383 (WEBER BERND CLAUS [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,6-18 * page 5, paragraph 43 - page 6, paragraph 50; figure 3; claims 1-17 * | by applicant | US5590660 | US5772580 | DE10116859 |