EP1329692 - Method for determining map data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otte, Dirk Am Heesekamp 4 30880 Laatzen / DE | [2003/30] | Application number, filing date | 02024149.3 | 30.10.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | DE2002101519 | 17.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10201519 | [2003/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1329692 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329692 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1329692 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G06T17/50 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
G01C21/3867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/16] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ermitteln von Kartendaten | [2003/30] | English: | Method for determining map data | [2003/30] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer des données cartographiques | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 13.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0261450 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 12 * * column 5, line 47 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1003015 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US6173219 (DEKER GUY [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 9 *; | [A] - MEGHERBI D B ET AL, A distributed data compression/decompression technique for images via conformal mapping, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 2001, SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG, USA, PAGE(S) 169 - 180, VISUAL INFORMATION PROCESSING X, ORLANDO, FL, USA, 19-20 APRIL 2001, ISSN 0277-786X, XP009002155 [A] 1 * page 169 - page 173 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.438255 |