EP1416745 - Localisation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholz, Frank, Dr. St-Leonhard-Strasse 10a 85667 Oberpframmern / DE | [2004/19] | Application number, filing date | 02024265.7 | 31.10.2002 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416745 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, G08G1/0967 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
G08G1/205 (EP,US);
H04M11/04 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W74/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/04] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lokalisierungsverfahren | [2004/19] | English: | Localisation method | [2004/19] | French: | Procédé de localisation | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5563931 (BISHOP RONALD D [US], et al) [Y] 4,6,9 * figures 1,5 * * column 6, lines 29-70 * * column 7, lines 29-50 ** column 9, lines 35-38 *; | [Y]EP0897168 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 4, lines 16-60 *; | [XY]EP1209930 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,10,11 * column 1, lines 15-20 * * column 2, lines 20-25,39-45 * * column 4, lines 24-60 * [Y] 2,4,6,9 |